judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TARO GEHANI V. GEORGE PRICE ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0573
Short Caption:TARO GEHANI V. GEORGE PRICE ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR7813-08Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTaro GehaniN
Richard S. BasileYY
Madalyn E. Johns NN
AppelleeGeorge Price N
Amy R. MixNN
AppelleeFinancial FreedomN
Michael N. Russo, Jr.NY
Michael S. Steadman, Jr.YY
AppelleeU.S. Department of Housing & DevelopmentN
Fred E. HaynesNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/23/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 29, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledStatement Of Issues for Review (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Financial Freedom Senior Funding Corp & Financial Freedom Acquisition, LLC)
08/30/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte directing appellees George Price and the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development to file their briefs within 15 days from the order, accompanied by a motion for leave
09/07/2011FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief - from U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) regarding the order of August 30, 2011 stating that HUD will not be filing a brief in this appeal (Appellee U.S. Department of Housing & Development) (Appellee U.S. Department of Housing & Development)
09/14/2011FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Appellee Price)
09/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/22/2011FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief - stating the George Price will not be submitting a brief (Appellee Price)
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/05/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee George Price, ET AL)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/29/2012FiledAppearance of Madalyn E. Johns (Appellant)
03/29/2012FiledArgued before Judge Thompson, Easterly, Steadman
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMandate