judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP AND ADOPTION OF JAMIL

Case Information: 35010
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP AND ADOPTION OF JAMILCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G17789
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D210474
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/29/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/22/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Paul M. Gaudet--check no. 3322.
10/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10328
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/02/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jimmerson Hansen, P.C.--check no. 16028.
11/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-10650
11/04/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
11/22/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. 99-11658
12/06/1999MotionFiled Motion. Sam and Talia Zeet hereby consent to the substiution of Michael F. Bohn as attorney for respondents and cross-appellants in the place of James J. Jimmerson. 99-12221
12/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-12877
02/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant attorney Jimmerson's moton to withdraw as counsel of record for respondents/cross-appellants. We order that attorney Bohn shall be substituted as counsel for respondents/cross-appellants pursuant to the notice of substitution of attorneys filed on December 6, 1999. 00-02144
04/26/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 25, 2000. 00-06814
06/30/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-11219
07/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend deadline for Filing Opposition to Motion. 00-12534
07/25/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellants' opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss provisionally submitted on July 19, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-12841
07/25/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. 00-12493
07/28/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), Reply to Opposition Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
08/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 2 matters have been submitted to the Supreme Court for decision. Case 32436 on termination rights is pending for decision after oral argument. Ruling in 32436 may result in dismissal of pending appeal in 35010. Also will hold settlement conference pending until motion to dismiss in 35010 is decided. 00-14232
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Paul M. Gaudet. 00-19058
02/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-02693
02/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent.) Due Date: 15 days
02/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. appellant/cross-respondent. 01-03591
02/28/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for respondent/cross-appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
03/07/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statements, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal and cross-appeal. Appellants/cross-respondents and respondents/ cross-appellants: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellants/cross-respondents: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondents/cross-appellants: 30 days thereafter to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellants/cross-respondents: 20 days thereafter to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant: 10 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. fn1[We defer ruling on respondents/cross-appellants' June 30, 2000 motion to dismiss as frivolous, pending further order of this court. 01-04121
03/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate of Counsel Pertaining to Transcript on Appeal. 01-05161
03/26/2001MotionFiled Motion. Attorney Paul M. Gaudet. 01-05293
04/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Respondent's Cross-Appeal. 01-05628
06/25/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on April 2, 2001. " . . . the cross-appeal filed by Sam Z. and Talia Z. is dismissed." The clerk shall amend the case caption in this matter to reflect that Hikmet J. and Raja J. are the appellants and Sam Z. and Talia Z. are the respondents. 01-10633
06/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of attorney Paul M. Gaudet to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants, filed March 26, 2001. Mr. Gaudet shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellants and file proof of such service with this court. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to either obtain new counsel to represent them in this appeal and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court, or inform this court in writing that they do not intend to retain new counsel. The briefing schedule is suspended pending further order of this court. 01-10634
07/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of this court's June 25, 2001, order on appellants. 01-11127
09/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-16148
10/29/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 4. SEALED by District Court Order filed March 24, 1999. 01-18105
10/29/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[In light of this order, we deny respondents' June 30, 2000 motion to dismiss. On June 25, 2001, we granted appellants' attorney permission to withdraw as counsel of record, and ordered appellants to retain new counsel or inform this court that they did not intend to retain counsel. On August 15, 2001, appellants moved this court for permission to proceed in proper person, and requested leave to file any documents to aid in the resolution of this appeal. As written briefs and additional documents are not necessary to resolve this appeal, we deny appellant's request for leave to file documents.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04553
03/15/2002MotionFiled Motion for Stay. 02-04727
04/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 15, 2002, respondents filed a motion to stay the appeal. In light of this court's order of affirmance, respondents' motion is denied as moot. 02-05901
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 4. SEALED by District Court Order filed March 24, 1999 returned this day. 02-04657
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 12, 2002. 02-04657