judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARIUS CASH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0574
Short Caption:DARIUS CASH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-12813-10Filed Date:05/09/2011

Opening Event Date:05/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/28/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarius Cash Y
Regina V. WagnerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ephraim Wernick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michaels, Esquire
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/16/2011RECEIVED - motion for non appeal transcript
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (71 pgs/Walker) 2/3/11 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (80 pgs/Swaringer) 2/4/11 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (160 pgs/Swaringer) 2/7/11 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (6 pgs/Swaringer) 2/8/11 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (17 pgs/Swaringer) 2/9/11 proc. w/cd
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (SEALED pleading)
07/26/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/26/2011FiledRecord Index
07/26/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/04/2011FiledReceived - July 26/11 order to Regina Michaels, Esquire, returned by PO "return to sender - insufficient address - unable to forward". Obtained correct address and remailed order and set new dates.(Appellant) (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File brief to 1/31/12. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/31/12.
01/31/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/31/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) (attached to the brief)
02/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/28/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/12/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Schwelb
07/13/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
08/06/2012FiledMandate