Case: 13-99-00817-CR
13-99-00817-CR
12/27/1999
Aggravated Sexual Assault
FERNANDO FUENTES
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/31/2001 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
10/19/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/02/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
08/02/2001 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/27/2001 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |||
06/22/2001 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
05/24/2001 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
05/24/2001 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/09/2001 | Motion to withdraw as counsel | | |||
03/08/2001 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
01/17/2001 | Submitted | | |||
01/17/2001 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |||
01/17/2001 | Address Change | | |||
12/12/2000 | Submission | | |||
11/20/2000 | Oral argument requested | | |||
11/20/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/19/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
10/12/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/03/2000 | Response to _____________. | | |||
09/29/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/25/2000 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
09/14/2000 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Carried with the case | | ||
09/13/2000 | Motion to Abate the Appeal | | |||
08/30/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/30/2000 | Oral argument requested | | |||
08/30/2000 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/10/2000 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
08/09/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Sup Record | | |||
07/31/2000 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
07/31/2000 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
07/31/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
07/21/2000 | Green card in | | |||
07/13/2000 | Order Entered | | |||
06/21/2000 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
06/20/2000 | Green card in | | |||
06/15/2000 | Order Entered | | |||
04/07/2000 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
03/30/2000 | request for documents | | |||
03/02/2000 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
01/28/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
01/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/27/1999 | docketing statement received | | |||
12/27/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/19/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fuentes, Fernando | Appellant | Daniel Reyes |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Theodore C. Hake |
Trial Court Information
389th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Ann Murray Moore
CR-2543-99-H
Ct's 1,2,&20yrs 4 & 5- TDCJ