judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4274
B-4274
10/30/1973
Application for Writ of Error
MAPCO, INC.
GEORGE F. BUZZARD, ET AL. AND ELIZABETH COX LYNN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/29/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/14/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/30/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/21/1974Response to Motion filed
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1973Reply to Response
11/14/1973Response to Petition
10/30/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/30/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George F. Buzzard, et al. and Elizabeth Cox Lynn, et al.Respondent
MAPCO, INC.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information