judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARRIAGE HOUSE VS. NEVADA TAX COMMISSION

Case Information: 36505
Short Caption:CARRIAGE HOUSE VS. NEVADA TAX COMMISSIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A391736Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/09/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Allison MacKenzie Hartman Soumbeniotis & Russell--check no. 18880. Additional $100 due.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13390
08/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Additional $100 due. Due Date: 10 days
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $100.00 from Allison MacKenzie Hartman Soumbeniotis & Russell--check no. 18924.
08/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/20/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Continued for approval of settlement agreement by Tax Commission and State Board of Equalization. Settlement Judge expects approval by April 10, 2001. 01-03173
04/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal. 01-06215
04/20/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-06761
04/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-07080
04/27/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.