judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHWEST BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. NORTHWEST DISTRIBUTING CO., INC., a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0283)
Case Number:S-11-0283Case Docketed On:12/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:NORTHWEST BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. NORTHWEST DISTRIBUTING CO., INC., a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:NORTHWEST BUILDING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. NORTHWEST DISTRIBUTING CO., INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthwest Building Comany, LLCChristopher Michael Wages
Greg L. Goddard
Tucker J. Ruby
AppelleeNorthwest Distributing Co., Inc.Thomas J. Klepperich
Dan B. Riggs
Amanda Kay Roberts

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 113
Citation:285 P.3d 239 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2012Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/14/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/16/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/06/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Christopher M. Wages obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Amanda K. Roberts obo Appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Tucker J. Ruby for Appellant (Mr. Ruby will also be presenting oral argument)Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Tucker S. Ruby for Appellant; Amanda Kay Roberts for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/29/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/14/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal