judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESCALANTE VS. NEVADA DEPT OF PRISONS

Case Information: 36500
Short Caption:ESCALANTE VS. NEVADA DEPT OF PRISONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A380725Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Webster, AnitaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/09/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/ suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13250
07/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Anita A. Webster. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Potter Law Offices-check no. 15404.
12/26/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-22446
12/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
01/10/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-00519
01/18/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-01190
01/19/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on January 18, 2001. 01-01293
01/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-01191
01/29/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-01865
03/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to (1) file an amended docketing statement which fully complies with NRAP 14, and (2) show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. 01-04100
04/09/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement. 01-06033
05/14/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/10/01. 01-07979
05/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-07980
06/12/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 06/08/01. 01-09781
06/12/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-09782
07/16/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 07/12/01. 01-11949
07/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 01-11950
01/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Allowing Appeal to Proceed. Although attorney Cal Potter's non-compliance with NRAP 14 and our March 6, 2001 order is sufficient to justify sanctioning him, we elect not to impose a sanction at this time. We, however, caution counsel for the parties that in the future we may well impose appropriate sanctions in the event the court perceives a lack of regard for our rules or orders. 02-01342
04/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-06229
04/09/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
06/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-09800
07/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10408
07/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2002. 02-10408