judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ANGEL SAAD

Case Information: 11-BG-0539
Short Caption:IN RE: ANGEL SAADClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN156-08Filed Date:05/02/2011

Opening Event Date:05/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/28/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Ray S. BolzeNN
RespondentAngel Saad NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/02/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of the plea and sentencing document concerning respondent. Respondent pled guilty on January 5, 2011, in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, to grand larceny in violation of New York Penal Code Sec 155.35
05/16/2011ORDER It appearing that the respondent pled guilty in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, to grand larceny, the court having received a certified copy of the plea and sentencing document, and it appearing that the offense constitutes a serious crime as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), it is ORDERED pursuant to S.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), that the respondent, Angel Saad, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offense and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503 (a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
07/11/2011FiledReport And Recommendation Of The BPR On Referral that the court disbar respondent pursuant to D.C. Code Sec 11-2503(a) based on his conviction of a crime of moral turpitude per se. Respondent's disbarment should be effective immediately but run, for purposes of reinstatement, from the date he files the affidavit required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14(g) (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
07/28/2011FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exceptions to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
08/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary 1
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/28/2012FiledSubmitted To Washington,Fisher,King
04/19/2012FiledDisbarment - ORDERED that respondent be disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, effective immediately, and his name be stricken from the roll of attorneys authorized to practice before this court. For the purposes of reinstatement, the period of disbarment shall not be deemed to commence until respondent files an affidavit that conforms to the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (WS,FI,KG)
05/03/2012LodgedLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (Petitioner Bar Counsel)