judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUNRISE HOSPITAL VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34991
Short Caption:SUNRISE HOSPITAL VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38801
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373928Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Earley Savage--check no. 015264.
10/18/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for a Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus. 99-10121
10/18/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus. 99-10123
10/21/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceeding pending Resolution of Writ of Prohibitionor, in the Alternative, Mandamus. 99-10265
10/21/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. 99-10268
10/22/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: "we deny the petition." [1] We deny the petitioner's motion for a stay as moot in light of this order. SNP99B-RR/MS/ML 99-10329
10/25/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Filed Original Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " ... we deny the petition." fn1[We deny the petitioner's motion for a stay as moot in light of this order]. SNP99B-RR/MS/NB 99-10412
10/25/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Reply to Real Party in Interest Banks' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Mandamus. (Pursuant to NRAP 27(a).)
11/17/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-11405
11/17/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.