judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANA L. GRAHAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0163)
Case Number:S-10-0163Case Docketed On:07/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANA L. GRAHAM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANA L. GRAHAM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDana L. GrahamDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2011 WY 39
Citation:247 P.3d 872

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/13/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk A. Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk A. Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/22/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/25/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/24/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal