judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRIS (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36512
Short Caption:HARRIS (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36287
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137409Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/26/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13482
09/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Administratively Closing Appeal, Vacating Prior Order, and Directing Transmission of Record on Appeal. The clerk of this court shall administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 36287. The matter shall hereafter proceed in this court under Docket No. 36512. That portion of this court's order of August 4, 2000, regarding the transmission of the record in Docket No. 36287 is hereby vacated. Instead, the clerk of the district court shall have 120 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court as the record on appeal in Docket No. 36512, a certified copy of the complete trial court record from the district court's findings of fact, conclusions of law and order of June 28, 2000, denying appellant's post-conviction petition. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36287, 36512. Document No. 00-15462.
12/26/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. Mailed: 12/21/00. 00-22402
12/26/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[We have considered the proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20683
01/07/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20828
01/07/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 01-20828