judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTIONE W. TUCKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0552
Short Caption:ANTIONE W. TUCKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-6407-09Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/29/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntione W. Tuckson Y
James W. KleinNY
Premal DhariaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
Yolanda Hibbler Sheffield NN
Chrisellen R. KolbNY
Trevor McFaddenYN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (147 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 8/25-26/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (109 pgs/Geddes) 9/1/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify-#3 (55 pgs/Mccarn)- 9/1/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (10 pgs/Geddes) 9/2/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (75 pgs/Mccarn) 9/2/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (14 pgs/Jeon) 9/3/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (144 pgs/Allison) 10/15/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (23 pgs/Allison) 10/15/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (97 pgs/Pirfo) 10/19/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (193 pgs/Swaringer) 2/14/09 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (194-387 pgs/Swaringer) 2/15/11 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (388-471 pgs/Swaringer) 2/16/11 proc.
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (28 pgs/tape) 4/25/11 proc. w/cd
07/29/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/29/2011FiledRecord Index
07/29/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 27, 2011 (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 12/27/11.
10/05/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (33 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 8/27/09 proc. w/cd
12/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/26/12.
03/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
04/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (6 pgs/Swaringer) 2/17/11 proc. w/cd
06/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 7/2/12
07/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/31/12
08/29/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/29/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/13/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
11/15/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
12/05/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/10/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
12/10/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Thompson, Ruiz Justin Murray, Esq. for appellant Trevor McFadden, Esq. for appellee
02/04/2013FiledOrder directing parties to file supplemental briefs.
03/05/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
04/04/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
04/19/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/07/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
10/03/2013FiledReversed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ruiz, Senior Judge.)
10/16/2013FiledMotion to expedite issuance of the mandate. (Appellant)Granted
10/24/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to expedite issuance of the mandate.
10/24/2013FiledMandate