judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MUNSON VS. PALACE JEWELRY AND LOAN CO.

Case Information: 33049
Short Caption:MUNSON VS. PALACE JEWELRY AND LOAN CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9708532Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rodney E. Sumpter-check no. 5154.
09/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
10/05/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/26/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
10/28/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
10/29/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on October 26, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith.
10/29/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
12/07/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/22/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
01/06/1999Other Other. Filed Substitution of Counsel. Bader & Ryan in place and stead of Hardesty, Bader & Ryan, Ltd.
01/08/1999Other Other. Filed Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a).
04/28/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to file opening brief and appendix.
04/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of bankruptcy.
07/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant Munson's appeal is stayed pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law. We also stay the appeal of appellant Richards, Inc. Appellant Munson's counsel shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, serve and file with this court a report of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. We deny respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal for appellant's having failed to file a timely opening brief.
09/09/1999Other Other. Filed status report.
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellants' counsel shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, file with this court a report on the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Should the bankruptcy proceedings conclude before the time for filing the status report, appellants' counsel shall immediately so inform this court.
02/09/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal.
05/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We disapprove the stipulation for dismissal of this appeal with prejudice filed on February 9, 2000. Appellant Munson's counsel shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file with this court a report on the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. The appeal may then proceed or be dismissed by stipulation. Failure to comply with the orders of this court in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
05/04/2000Other Other. Filed report in compliance with Order.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On May 4, 2000, appellants filed a status report. Appellants indicate that the stay was not in effect at the time the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss, and seem to indicate that they wish this court to now approve the stipulation that we disapproved in our order on may 1, 2000. We elect to treat appellants' request as a motion to dismiss this appeal, and we grant that motion. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17321
10/02/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.