judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BADEBANA ATCHOLE V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0547
Short Caption:BADEBANA ATCHOLE V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB054-10Filed Date:05/06/2011

Opening Event Date:05/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBadebana AtcholeNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/06/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
05/06/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00 PAID
05/10/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and to Todd S.Kim(OAG) and Gregory Lamb (DOES)
05/31/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
05/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
07/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) to 10/3/2011.
09/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 12/15/11
12/15/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
12/15/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
01/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
01/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) 3/19/12
03/06/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From petitioner (Petitioner)
03/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Denied as Moot
03/21/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)Granted
04/12/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)
04/12/2012FiledDismissed
05/04/2012FiledMandate