judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVE B. GLENN v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0016)
Case Number:S-07-0016Case Docketed On:01/22/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:STEVE B. GLENN v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
Full Title:STEVE B. GLENN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteve B. GlennFrederick J. Harrison
AppelleeUnion Pacific Railroad CompanyMark C. Hansen
George E. Lemich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 16
Citation:176 P.3d 640

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/22/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/22/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - certifying good cause for an extension of time to file briefs.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/14/2007Motion - Supplement the record - stipulation to include omitted materials in the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
03/19/2007Order - Grant - stipulation between the parties to include in the record certain listed depositions erroneously omitted from the record for the purposes of this appealOrderGrantFinal
03/20/2007Motion - Supplement the record - modify or correct the content of the record pursuant to W.R.A.P. 3.04MotionSupplement the recordFinal
04/11/2007Order - Granting Motion to Modify the Content of the RecordOrderGrantFinal
04/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/25/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellantFinal
05/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/30/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/14/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Frederick J. Harrison on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark C. Hansen for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - No designation of record from counsel for appellant, no proper designation from counsel for appellee.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
08/20/2007Order - Sanction - designation of record - appellant.OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received original and six copies of designation of record on appeal via UPS. Called Mr. Harrison and told him to file designation of record in District Court and to send us a copy.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record. Received faxed copy of appellee's designation of record.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from Union PacificNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/24/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
08/24/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I, II & IV, original papers; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
09/20/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frederick J. Harrison for appellant; George E. Lemich and Mark C. Hansen, argument by Mr. Hansen for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/20/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/26/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/26/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal