judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JORDAN, MICHAEL B. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1233
Short Caption:JORDAN, MICHAEL B. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3654-79Filed Date:10/15/1980

Opening Event Date:10/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/31/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/31/1983
Argued/Submitted:04/28/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JORDAN, MICHAEL B. UNITED STATES
10/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1980FiledRecord Completed
01/31/1983FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition