judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS CHILDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0549
Short Caption:THOMAS CHILDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18409-10Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/13/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/06/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/17/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Magdalena AcevedoYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (120 pgs/tape) 12/13/10 proc.
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (21 pgs/tape) 2/14/11 proc. w/cd
06/13/2011RECORD COPIES
06/13/2011RECORD INDEX
06/13/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/31/11.
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 1/30/12.
01/05/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
01/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion to supplement the record.
02/06/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (exhibit #2)
02/06/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/06/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/06/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
04/17/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
04/25/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte setting for oral argument.
04/30/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
05/04/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
06/25/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
07/13/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/17/2012FiledMandate