judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL LEE HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0290)
Case Number:S-11-0290Case Docketed On:12/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:DANIEL LEE HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL LEE HARRIS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDaniel L. Harris Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/16/2011Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
12/16/2011Petition - Writ - review (Certificate of service date 10/21/2011, postmarked 11/18/2011 and received 11/21/2011. On same day request for docket fee or motion to proceed IFP requested, received and filed 12/16/2011)PetitionWrit - reviewFinal
01/04/2012Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal