Case Information: 17-CV-0888 | |||
Short Caption: | DAYO ADETU, ET AL V. SIDWELL FRIENDS SCHOOL | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB9948-15 | Filed Date: | 08/07/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/07/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 09/01/2017 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/18/2017 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/12/2018 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/14/2019 |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | Dayo Adetu | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellant | Titilayo Adetu | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellant | Nike Adetu | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | Sidwell Friends School | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/07/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (143-pgs/Henderson 9/21/16 proceeding) | ||
08/29/2017 | Filed | Order that appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order file the required mediation screening form | ||
09/01/2017 | Filed | Record Index | ||
09/01/2017 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/07/2017 | Filed | Mediation Screening Statement (Appellant Adetu) | ||
09/18/2017 | Filed | Referred to Mediation | ||
09/19/2017 | Filed | Screened Out | ||
09/28/2017 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
10/11/2017 | Filed | Amended notice of appeal (Appellant Adetu) | ||
10/18/2017 | Filed | Statement Of Issues (Appellant Adetu) | ||
10/18/2017 | Filed | Amended Statement Of Issues (Appellant Adetu) | ||
10/19/2017 | Filed | Second amended Statement Of Issues (Appellant Adetu) | ||
11/01/2017 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record AND for issuance of new briefing order (Appellant Adetu) | Granted | |
11/02/2017 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellants Adetu) | Granted | |
11/02/2017 | Filed | Appearance by Shameka Bloyce Esq. (Appellee) | ||
11/06/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record#2 (28-pgs/tape 10/2/17 proceeding) | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | GRANT - Order Appellant's Motion to Supplement is granted; Branch Chief, Civil Actions to certify new record index reflecting 10/2/17 order, 10/11/17 amended notice of appeal forthwith. | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Lodged Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | Brief (Appellant Adetu) | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | Joint Appendix (Appellant Adetu) | ||
12/05/2017 | Filed | Record Index | ||
12/18/2017 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
12/18/2017 | Filed | Appendix (Appellee) | ||
12/18/2017 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/04/2018 | Filed | Motion To Strike appellee's appendix (Appellant Adetu) | Denied | |
01/08/2018 | Filed | Reply (Appellant Adetu) | ||
01/11/2018 | Filed | Opposition to appellant's motion to strike (Appellee) | ||
01/23/2018 | Filed | Order Denying Motion To Strike appellee's appendix (Appellant Adetu) | ||
03/27/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | ||
07/31/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/12/2018 | Filed | Argued before Chief Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge Beckwith, and Senior Judge Farrell. (Richard Carnell Baker, Esq. for appellant Dayo Adetu) (Brian A. Scotti, Esq. for appellee Sidwell Friends School) | ||
09/13/2018 | Filed | Appellant's Notice Regarding Appellee's Appendix (Appellant Adetu) | ||
09/26/2018 | Filed | Reply to appellants' notice/praecipe regarding appellee's appendix (Appellee) | ||
01/23/2019 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ | ||
02/14/2019 | Filed | Mandate | ||
05/02/2019 | Filed | Copy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari | ||
06/24/2019 | Filed | Notice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari |