judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT C. LEAKE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0554
Short Caption:ROBERT C. LEAKE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-17133-10Filed Date:05/03/2011

Opening Event Date:05/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/14/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/11/2013
Argued/Submitted:04/30/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert C. Leake Y
James W. KleinNY
Christine A. Monta NN
Samia FamNY
Esteban MorinYN
Matthew S. HellmanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Christine MaceyYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/20/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)))
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (56 pgs/Burr) 12/14/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (85 pgs/Janifer) 2/2/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (86-216 pgs/Janifer) 2/3/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (27 pgs/Price) 2/4/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (13 pgs/tape) 4/8/11 proc. w/cd
07/25/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/25/2011FiledRecord Index
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (116 pgs/Johnson) 12/15/10 proc.
03/14/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (91 pgs/Johnson) 12/16/10 proc. w/cd
03/14/2012FiledRecord Completed
03/23/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/27/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant) to 7/31/2012.
07/27/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 10/29/12
10/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted in Part/Denied in Part
11/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/28/12
11/16/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (65 pgs/Janifer) 2/2/11 proc. w/cd
11/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/07/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
12/12/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)
12/12/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/11/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/11/2013FiledBriefing Completed
01/30/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
01/30/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/26/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/11/2013FiledAppearance by Matthew S. Hellman on behalf of Robert Leake (Appellant)
04/08/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/24/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
04/24/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/30/2013FiledArgued Before Judges, Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker. Esteban Morin Esq.,for appellant, Christine Macey Esq.,for appellee.
10/17/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
11/07/2013FiledAffirmed (AMENDED OPINION) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge)
11/15/2013FiledMandate