judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOLDIE INC. VS. TAYLOR INT'L CORP.

Case Information: 36514
Short Caption:GOLDIE INC. VS. TAYLOR INT'L CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366830Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/09/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen Nelson & Sanders--check no. 25474.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13487
08/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent, Taylor International Corporation's, Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-20295
12/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant, Goldie, Incorporated's Opposition to Taylor International Corporation's "Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction" or Alternatively Request to Amend or Modify. 00-21132
12/19/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 00-22108
02/02/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Settlement Judge recommends removal pending resolution of jurisictional issue. 01-02217
02/02/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
02/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program pending a decision on respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jursdiction. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a jurisdicitonal review of this appeal. If this court determines that jurisdiction is proper, settlement conference proceedings pursuant to NRAP 16 shall resume. 01-03775
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-04363
03/12/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-04433
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. We defer ruling on the merits of respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal. fn3[On December 19, 2000, respondent filed a motion for leave to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss appeal. Accompanying the motion was a copy of the reply which respondent seeks to have filed. We grant leave and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on December 19, 2000.] Appellant: 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; 30 days to file an amended docketing statement that fully complies with NRAP 14. Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. Counsel for appellant, Kurt D. Anderson, shall show cause within 30 days from the date of this order why he should not be sanctioned for his failure to provide full and accurate responses to docketing statement requests 22 and 23. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15082
09/06/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondent, Taylor International Corporation's Relpy Supporting Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-22109
10/08/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-16825
10/08/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended docketing statement. 01-16826
10/15/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellant Goldie Incorporated's Motion for Stay of Proceedings. 01-17400
10/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Amended Docketing Statement). 01-17453
10/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Response to Order to Show Cause). 01-17454
04/03/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. ORDER ALLOWING APPEAL TO PROCEED, IMPOSING SANCTIONS, AND DENYING MOTION FOR STAY. In November, 2000, respondent filed a motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, which appellant opposes. Having considered jurisdictional concerns, we conclude that Goldie, Inc. is an aggrieved party and the order appealed from is a special order made after final judgment. We therefore deny Taylor International Corporation's motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Furthermore, we deny as moot Goldie Inc.'s alternative request for leave to file a petition for writ of mandamus, or to have this court consider its notice of appeal as a request for issuance of a writ of mandamus. Accordingly, the settlement conference proceedings shall resume pursuant to NRAP 16. The settlement judge shall have thirty days from the date of this order within which to schedule this appeal for a settlement conference. The time requirements for transcript request forms and briefing shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. Our September order directed Goldie, Inc.'s counsel, Kurt D. Anderson, to demonstrate why he should not be sanctioned for failing to provide a full and accurate response to requests 22 and 23. In response, Mr. Anderson insists that the "text of docketing statement request 22 is accurate." Whereas the information provided may be accurate, the response is certainly incomplete. In addition Mr. Anderson acknowledged that through "inadvertence" some documents he had intended to attach to the original docketing statement in response to request 23 were not attached. Accordingly, within thirty days from the date of this order, attorney Kurt D. Anderson shall personally pay to the Clark County Law Library the sum of two hundred and fifty dollars. In addition, Kurt D. Anderson shall provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment no later than ten calendar days after he remits payment to the Clark County Law Library. In October 2001, Goldie, Inc. filed a motion to stay this appeal. Having considered Goldie, Inc's motion for a stay, we deny the request. 02-05941
04/08/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 29, 2002. 02-06187
04/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. Kurt D. Anderson - check no. 1557 in the amount of $250.00. 02-07055
05/02/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-07757
05/31/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 02-09555
06/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On May 31, 2002, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal and, cause appearing, the motion is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-10243
06/13/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.