judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TOMMY J. TALENT v. CITY OF ABILENE, ET AL.

Case: B-4267
B-4267
10/18/1973
Application for Writ of Error
TOMMY J. TALENT
CITY OF ABILENE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/08/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/14/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/07/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/18/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/08/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/24/1974Dissenting opinion issued.
04/24/1974Opinion issued
02/14/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/07/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/23/1974Document received (See Remarks)
11/09/1973Response to Petition
10/18/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/18/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
Tommy J. TalentPetitioner
City of Abilene, et al.Respondent
Charles E. Humphrey, Jr., Keith Short and B. J. Walter, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information