judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRATT VS. VANCOM, INC.

Case Information: 36513
Short Caption:PRATT VS. VANCOM, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366181Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/09/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hafen, Porter & Storm, Ltd--check no. 5614
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13483
08/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-19529
11/09/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
04/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-06177
04/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-06985
06/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Appeal. 01-09595
06/08/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrwal of Appeal. 01-09597
06/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-10556
06/22/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
07/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order Dismissing Appeal. (No action required.) 01-11097