judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK P. WILLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0553
Short Caption:FRANK P. WILLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:11-CF-0553Consolidated: 11-CF-0764
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-16975-10Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/06/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/30/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/15/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrank P. Willis YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Amy JaquetteNN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Stephen F. RickardYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Deborah A. Persico, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Deborah A. Persico, Esquire
06/20/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/02/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (HOWARD)
08/05/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CF-553 and 11-CF-764. F/O Appointing David Reiter, Esquire in appeal no. 11-CF-764.
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (364 pgs/Davis) 1/3-4/11 proc
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (10 pgs/Davis) 1/5-6/11 proc.
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (214 pgs/Henderson) 1/10/11 proc.
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (112 pgs/Henderson) 1/11/11 proc.
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (10 pgs/Davis) 1/12/11 proc. w/cd
08/26/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-553)
08/26/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-553)
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (17 pgs/tape) 1/26/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (30 pgs/tape) 3/31/11 proc w/cd
08/31/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/01/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-764)
09/01/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-764)
09/02/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until May 10, 2012 (Howard) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to May 12, 2012 (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellants Willis and Howard's motions for extension to file briefs and limited appendices to 5/12/12.
05/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Willis) (Appellant)
05/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Willis) (Appellant) and (Howard) Appellant to 5/31/12
05/30/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) (Howard)
05/30/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
06/07/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) to the extent that documents attached as Appendix A & B to aplt's brief are considered part of the record on appeal.
06/21/2012FiledAnswer/Response to appellant's motion to supplement the record (Appellee)
06/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) TO 8/6/12
08/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (exhibit CD of vedeiotaped statement give to police by defendent)
08/06/2012FiledAppendix (Appellee)
08/06/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/06/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/15/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/27/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant, Howard)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/02/2013FiledMemorandum - Attorney Rickard will argue in place of Attorney Jaquette. (Appellee)
01/09/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/15/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
01/15/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/30/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Farrell, Deborah A. Persico, Esq. for appellant Frank P. Willis David H. Reiter, Esq. for appellant Maurice D. Howard Stephen Rickard, Esq. for appellee
03/22/2013FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
04/02/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Howard) (Appellant)
04/15/2013FiledMandate
04/15/2013FiledMandate
04/15/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)