judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLESE JENEAN HALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0550
Short Caption:CARLESE JENEAN HALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-30354-08Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/02/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/04/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/03/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlese J. Hall YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Suzanne G. CurtYN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas D. Engle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas D. Engle, Esquire
05/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (8 pgs/Graybill) 4/7/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (8 pgs/Van Bremen) 12/1/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (8 pgs/Kazorowski) 12/8/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (105 pgs/Drury) 12/9-10/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (557 pgs/Lindsay) 12/13-15/10 proc
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (558-746 pgs/Lindsay) 12/16/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (213 pgs/Johnson) 12/20/10 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (26 pgs/Johnson) 12/21/10 proc. w/cd
09/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/29/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/29/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/29/2011FiledRecord Index
11/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion fo extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/17/12.
01/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/2/12.
02/21/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
03/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/17/12.
05/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/18/12
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) 7/2/12.
07/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/02/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/15/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/17/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/04/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Glickman,Blackburne-Rigsby,Farrell, Thomas D. Engle Esq.,for appellant, Suzanne G. Curt Esq.,for appellee.
01/24/2013FiledLetter From Appellant Requesting Reconsideration of order filed with Superior Court denying her motion to stay VVCC (Appellant)
03/12/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/19/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/03/2013FiledMandate
07/18/2014FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
07/23/2014FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
05/26/2015FiledOrder Denying Motion to Recall Mandate