judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK R. ESPINOZA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-11-0291)
Case Number:S-11-0291Case Docketed On:12/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:PATRICK R. ESPINOZA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:PATRICK R. ESPINOZA, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick R. EspinozaR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Douglas J. Moench
Kristin M. Nuss
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2012 WY 101
Citation:280 P.3d 1226 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/19/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/21/2011Event - Phone Call from Steve Nelson at the AG's office. The attorney's assigned to this case at this time are Gregory Phillips and Douglas Moench. Changed case participants screen.EventPhone CallFinal
02/01/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Patrick R. EspinozaEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/20/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Wyoming Department of Transportation; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/10/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/25/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/10/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/14/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal