judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAFORM (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 28311
Short Caption:LAFORM (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR92P1554Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/02/1996How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/1996Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal.
04/02/1996Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/01/1996MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to File Opening Brief in Propria Persona. (Original and 2 copies-one copy returned to LaForm).
05/01/1996BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Original and 2 copies-one copy returned).
10/19/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the district court to order the prompt preparation of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing conducted on January 26, 1996. Upon completion of the transcript, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal.
10/23/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 2.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal, Vol. 2 returned this day. 00-13739
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 14, 2000. 00-13739