judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRON D. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0551
Short Caption:TYRON D. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-21934-09Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyron D. Harris Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/18/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
05/18/2011TMC - OTSC - motion to file (LODGED) response
06/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (no oppo).
06/10/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.
06/20/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR LEAVE IS GRNATED and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED RESPONSE. It is ***MORE****
06/20/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/20/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shalll transmit a copy of counsel's response to the show cause order to Superior Court to be filed as a DC Code 23-110 motion...SEE HARDCOPY (BRNBKG)
06/20/2011DISMISSED
08/12/2011FiledMandate
05/17/2012LodgedReceived Defendtant's motion pursuant to 23 D.C. Code 23-110 to vacate his original sentence and to impose a new sentence (Appellant)