judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PICHE VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO.

Case Information: 36511
Short Caption:PICHE VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37107
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A331211Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/09/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Potter Law Offices--check no. 15376.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13479
08/03/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 28, 2000. 00-13652
08/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-16291
09/20/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
02/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-03717
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-04455
03/19/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-04867
04/04/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 01-05734
04/04/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.