judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIMS OF: RYAN DORMAN, AN EMPLOYEE OF MELEHES BROTHERS, INC. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0292)
Case Number:S-11-0292Case Docketed On:12/20/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIMS OF: RYAN DORMAN, AN EMPLOYEE OF MELEHES BROTHERS, INC. v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIMS OF: RYAN DORMAN, AN EMPLOYEE OF MELEHES BROTHERS, INC., Appellant (Petitioner/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent/Objector).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRyan DormanSean W. Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Michael J. Finn
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 94
Citation:281 P.3d 342

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/20/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - Filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
02/03/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of appellant's designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/10/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/18/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/03/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
07/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Combined Application and Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Notice of Objection; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/07/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/15/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal