judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSEQUIST VS. INT'L ASSN OF FIREFIGHTERS LOCAL 1908

Case Information: 36506
Short Caption:ROSEQUIST VS. INT'L ASSN OF FIREFIGHTERS LOCAL 1908Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389382Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Webster, AnitaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bell and Young, Ltd.--check no. 101015.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13393
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Anita A. Webster. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-17737
10/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/16/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18273
10/20/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-18624
10/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-19138
02/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-02618
03/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation filed on February 8, 2001, as a joint motion, and we grant the motion. Appellant shall have to and including May 14, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-05066
05/14/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/10/01. 01-07956
05/14/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-07958
06/15/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 06/13/01. 01-10033
07/11/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: No postmark. 01-11711
01/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-01190
01/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
07/18/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. SNP02 02-12285
08/13/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-12810
08/13/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 16, 2002. 02-12810