judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAWN NATHAN STARRETT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0284)
Case Number:S-11-0284Case Docketed On:12/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:SHAWN NATHAN STARRETT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHAWN NATHAN STARRETT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShawn Nathan StarrettDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 133
Citation:286 P.3d 1033

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/20/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/15/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/02/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/18/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/23/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Redaction.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/17/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Mr. Starrett with unsigned and undated supplemental brief.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/17/2012Correspondence - Outgoing to Mr. Starrett advising him to motion this court for whatever relief he is requesting.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/05/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Appellant with copy of Supplemental BriefCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/18/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 10/19/2012 by agent for warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/07/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 11/6/2012 by agent for Warden at WSPServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/7/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal