judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SANQUAN CARTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0548
Short Caption:SANQUAN CARTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-23734-09Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/06/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSanquan Carter YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
James A. EwingNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
08/09/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/09/2011FiledRecord Index
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (SEALED pleadings)
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (34 pgs/tape) 11/19/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (36 pgs/Geddes) 4/12/10 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify -#4 (54 pgs/McCarn) 4/12/10 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (86 pgs/Rogers) 4/13/10 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (244 pgs/Hunt) 1/19/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (416 pgs/Maar) 1/20& 24/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (417-791 pgs/Maar) 1/25-26/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (9 pgs/Hawkins) 1/31/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (28 pgs/tape) 4/13/11 proc. w/cd
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (jury notes)
02/06/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (65 pgs/Walker) 3/29/10 proc.
02/06/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (11 pgs/Hawkins) 1/31/11 proc.
02/06/2012FiledRecord Completed
04/17/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/27/12
08/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/26/12
11/19/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/25/13
02/21/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/22/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/22/2013FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
03/25/2013FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
04/01/2013FiledOpposition to appellee's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
05/14/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/14/2013FiledAffirmed
06/05/2013FiledMandate
06/11/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)