Case Information: 17-CF-0812 | |||
Short Caption: | DANIEL JAMAL SMALLWOOD V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-5886-16 | Filed Date: | 07/24/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/24/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 11/17/2017 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/28/2018 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/08/2019 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/14/2020 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Daniel J. Smallwood | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/24/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
07/28/2017 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
07/28/2017 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Donna L. Biderman, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
08/15/2017 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
10/13/2017 | Filed | Record Index | ||
10/13/2017 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #1 (14 pages/tape) 5/12/16 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (6 pages/tape) 6/13/16 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (5 pages/tape) 7/14/16 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (8 pages/tape) 8/12/16 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (9 pages/Gardener) 5/15/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (10 pages/Gardener) 5/19/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (64 pages/Clark) 5/22/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #8 (65-192 pages/Clark) 5/23/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #9 (193-318 pages/Clark) 5/24/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #10 (319-342 pages/Clark) 5/25/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #11 (12 pages/tape) 7/21/17 proceeding | ||
11/17/2017 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/28/2017 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
01/08/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
02/07/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 4/16/18 | ||
04/17/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
04/19/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 7/18/18 | ||
07/18/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
07/18/2018 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
07/19/2018 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/24/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) and the lodged documents will be forwarded to the director, Criminal Division for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. | ||
08/13/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
08/14/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)to 10/15/18 | ||
08/22/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record #12 (Rosser Letter, Order Denying Rule 35 Motion) | ||
09/28/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
09/28/2018 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/29/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
01/31/2019 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
03/05/2019 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
03/05/2019 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion to file reply brief. | ||
03/05/2019 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
03/08/2019 | Filed | Submitted To Chief Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges Fisher, and Easterly. | ||
08/21/2020 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ | ||
08/28/2020 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | ||
09/14/2020 | Filed | Mandate |