judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANKS VS. LVMPD

Case Information: 36507
Short Caption:FRANKS VS. LVMPDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31411 , 40760
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A370599Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/09/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/13/2002 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/13/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Thomas D. Beatty--check no. 10695.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13400
08/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Kathleen M. Paustian is hereby substituted as attorney for LVMPD in the above-entitled action, in place of and instead of Ricciardi & Paustian. 00-19844
11/15/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
11/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Counsel for Appellant advised on 11/17/00 that he is waiting to hear back from the Federal Court counsel for Appellants re: further settlement negotiations, continuance of appeal or dismissal. Accordingly, this matter is continued for several weeks. 00-20318
02/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-02691
02/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
02/28/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-03690
02/28/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Junes 27, 2000. To Court Reporter: Dick Kangas. 01-03692
04/02/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Court reporter Dick Kangas: 30 days to prepare and file the transcript requested on February 28, 2001. If the transcript was previously prepared and filed in the district court prior to the docketing of this appeal, the court reporter need not comply with NRAP 9(b), rather the court reporter shall inform this court in writing that the transcript was previously prepared and filed in the district court. Appellants: 100 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-05597
04/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 27, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 01-06311
07/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 10, 2001. 01-11719
08/13/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 08/10/01. 01-13745
08/13/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 9. 01-13748
09/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 10, 2001. 01-15287
10/12/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/10/01. 01-17228
11/14/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 11/10/01. 01-18984
04/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on May 13, 2002, at 9:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02M-WM/DA/ML)
04/29/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
05/13/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. Argued by: Thomas D. Beatty, as counsel for appellants and Kathleen M. Paustian, as counsel for respondent. SNP02-WM/DA/ML
05/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Kathleen M. Paustian. 02-08351
08/20/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP02M-Agosti, J. and Leavitt, J. Maupin, C.J., dissenting. 02-14227
09/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14809
09/27/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2002. 02-14809