judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUKE EDWARD MICKELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0285)
Case Number:S-11-0285Case Docketed On:12/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:LUKE EDWARD MICKELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LUKE EDWARD MICKELSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLuke Edward MickelsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 137
Citation:287 P.3d 750

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/21/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
01/23/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/13/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and received Certification regarding Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2012Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/16/2012Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, Exhibits and Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David E. Westling obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Justices Golden, Hill Voigt, Burke and District Judge Campbell (David Westling for Appellant; Jeffrey Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/30/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/15/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal