judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THE FOP, MPD LABOR COMMITTEE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0545
Short Caption:THE FOP, MPD LABOR COMMITTEE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6777-09Filed Date:04/29/2011

Opening Event Date:04/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/24/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFraternal Order of Police Metropolitian PoliceN
Paul A. FennYY
Barbara E. DuvallNN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (5-pgs/tape 1/8/10 proc.)
05/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (16-pgs/tape 6/4/10 proc.)
05/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (39-pgs/tape 7/6/10 proc.)w/cd
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 1, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 7/6/10, 6/4/10 & 1/8/10) *ordered by appellant (elp)
06/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
07/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before August 11, 2011. (JAC) elp
08/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
10/17/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for additional enlargment of time to file brief (Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/27/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/27/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/09/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/24/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Fisher,Easterly Paul A.Fenn esq.,for appellant Mary L.Wilson Esq.,for appellee
08/23/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
09/18/2012FiledMandate