judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF CAHILL

Case Information: 36502
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF CAHILLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9404658
Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9403379
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/2000 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David A. Adkins--check no. 1158.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13367
08/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Hon. Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-21509
12/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-22499
01/26/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-01794
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has not yet filed a stipulation to dismiss or otherwide communicated with this court. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-07293
05/22/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-08575
05/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-09083
05/31/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.