judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERDOVA G. BISHOP V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0538
Short Caption:VERDOVA G. BISHOP V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00149-10Filed Date:05/02/2011

Opening Event Date:05/02/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerVerdova G. Bishop NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY)
05/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/02/2011RECEIVED Petitioner's Motion to Consolidate this appeal with 10-AA-250 (Mpifp pend).
05/11/2011RECEIVED - Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate
05/25/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS DENIED and PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO TENDER the $100 FILING FEE W/N 20 DAYS...Failure to comply shall subject this petition to dismissal without further notice. It is ****MORE****
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since an appealable odrer has not been identified. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE to the extent that petitioner seeks review of the Final Order entered 5/2/10, why this petition should not be dismissed either for having been UNTIMELY FILED or for LACK OF STANDING... SEE HARDCOPY ***MORE****
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the LODGED PFR, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE and the OPPOSITION are HELD IN ABEYANCE. (BY: ETW) LW
06/07/2011RECEIVED - pet's oppo to motion to consolidate (returned for copies)
06/08/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/22/2011 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's MAY 25, 2011 order...the response thereto, wherein petioner concedes that the May 2, 2010 order indicated on the PFR DOES NOT EXIST and petitioner's motion to consolidate w/APPEAL 10AA250 and the opposition thereto, and it apearing that PETITIONER FAILED TO TENDER THE REQUIRED FEE, it is ORDERED that this PFR IS STRICKEN AND DISMISSED. See DC App R. 13: Vines v. Manufacturers Traders Trust Co... It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) LW
06/22/2011DISMISSED
07/14/2011FiledMandate