judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KORNTON VS. CONRAD, INC.

Case Information: 36501
Short Caption:KORNTON VS. CONRAD, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9808066Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Georgeson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/03/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Thomas A. Vallas, Esq.--check no. 1041.
08/01/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13310
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James Georgeson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-17623
10/04/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/16/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18272
10/19/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal without Prejudice. 00-18572
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court will only dismiss an appeal with prejudice. The parties shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a stipulation for dismissal of this appea, with prejudice, or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. We caution appellant that failure to comply withthis order may result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-20453
12/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remand Case for Limited Purpose. 00-21151
01/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 4, 2000, appellant filed a motion for remand. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our notice of October 4, 2000. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-00280
01/16/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-00877
05/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 45 days from the date of this order within which to (1) file an amended docketing statement which fully and accurately complies with NRAP 14, and (2) show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. In responding to this order, appellant shall submit documentation that establishes this court's jurisdiction including, but not necessarily limited to, a written, filed order certifying the summary judgment order as final and appealable pursuant to NRCP 54 (b). We caution appellant that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. In addition, counsel for appellant shall show cause why he should not be sanctioned for his failure to provide full and accurate responses to docketing statement request 22. Appellant's counsel failed to disclose the trial court's disposition of each claim which has been resolved, and failed to state the date of disposition of each claim which has been resolved. In addition, Korton's counsel failed to attach to the docketing statement a copy of each such disposition. Accordingly, Korton's counsel shall have 45 days within which to show cause why the imposition of sanctions is not warranted under NRAP 14(c). The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby suspended pending further order of this court (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 01-07349
06/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. (Appellant's). 01-10259
06/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Amended). 01-10261
07/19/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Raymond Gates verifying their address. (Address was incorrect on appellant's docketing statement.) 01-12293
03/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Determining Jurisdiction, Reinstating Briefing, and Imposing Sanctions. Granting Motion to Deny in Forma Pauperis Status, Directing Payment of Filing Fee, and Denying Motion to Strike. fn1[Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from them.] As appellants have not demonstrated that they are entitled to proceed in forma pauperis, we grant respondent's motion and vacate the district court's order granting in forma pauperis status to appellants. We direct appellants to pay the filing of $250 within 10 days of the date of this order. Failure to pay the fee may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. Appellants' motion to strike is denied. fn3[Although NRAP 24 does not specifically provide for respondent's motion, we have previously considered a motion seeking to correct a district court's order that did not comply with applicable rules, when the order was not itself appealable but was related to the pending appeal. Here, appellants failed to comply with NRS 12.015 and NRAP 24; accordingly, the district court's order granting in forma pauperis status was in error.] 02-04652
04/01/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. for attorney Thomas A. Vallas. 02-05760
04/01/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-05762
04/29/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. $250 to the Washoe County Law Library. 02-07514
06/13/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 06/12/02. 02-10271
06/13/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-10272
06/20/2002Other Other. Received table of contents to Appendix filed on 06/13/02. Attached to inside front cover of appendix.
07/17/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/16/02. 02-12240
07/25/2002MotionFiled Motion. Request for Oral Argument. 02-12764
07/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 25, 2002, respondent filed a request for oral argument. We deny respondent's motion. This court shall, in due course, conduct a review of the parties' briefs, appendices and appellate court record and determine whether oral argument may be beneficial to a resolution of this appeal. 02-12935
08/16/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 08/15/02. 02-14047
02/03/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-01782
02/03/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-RR/WM/MG
02/04/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Counsel for Appellant. 03-01866
04/28/2003Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Rose, Maupin and Gibbons, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. 119 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. NNP03. 03-07091
05/23/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-07622
05/23/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 2003. 03-07622