judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC DEP'T OF THE ENVIRONMENT V. EAST CAPITOL EXXON

Case Information: 11-AA-0540
Short Caption:DC DEP'T OF THE ENVIRONMENT V. EAST CAPITOL EXXONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Lead: 11-AA-0216 Consolidated:11-AA-0540
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DDOE00071-10Filed Date:05/02/2011

Opening Event Date:05/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/30/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerD.C. Department of Energy & EnvironmentN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleNY
RespondentEast Capitol ExxonNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (Filed by DC Gov't Agency -- no fee due)(No written decision was given)
05/05/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
06/01/2011ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE and petiton for review nos. 11-AA-216 and 11-AA-540 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is F/O that respondent shall within 30 days from teh date of this order advise this court as to the identify of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15(a)(5). (JAC)
07/21/2011FiledOrder directing Respondent to Identify Counsel.
07/21/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/23/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 10, 2011 (Petitioner)
10/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 10, 2011 (Petitioner)
11/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days to January 9. 2012. Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days to January 9. 2012. Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
01/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
01/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 2/8/12
02/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
02/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 3/9/12
03/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
04/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
04/10/2012FiledBrief (Appendix Attached) (Petitioner)
04/10/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
05/30/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte schedule before merits
05/30/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/03/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument D.C. Department of the Enviroment (Petitioner)Granted
10/31/2012FiledOrder Granting petitioner's motion for oral argument.
11/08/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Belson
04/25/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
05/17/2013FiledMandate