Case Information: 35022 | |||
Short Caption: | AMEEN (FREDERICK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152172 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/25/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/25/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-10396 | |
11/05/1999 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Ralph E. Baker shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. | 99-10861 | |
11/29/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. October 4, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Diann Prock. | 99-11835 | |
11/29/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. September 2, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. | 99-11900 | |
12/16/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-12717 | |
12/16/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 99-12718 | |
01/04/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-00082 | |
05/16/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. | 00-08168 | |
07/13/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-12074 | |
08/08/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13780 | |
08/08/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/20/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. | 00-13780 |