judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREG HUNTER and STACI HUNTER, husband and wife, v. RON REECE and LINDA REECE

Case Heading (S-10-0195)
Case Number:S-10-0195Case Docketed On:09/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:GREG HUNTER and STACI HUNTER, husband and wife, v. RON REECE and LINDA REECE
Full Title:GREG HUNTER and STACI HUNTER, husband and wife, Appellants (Defendants), v. RON REECE and LINDA REECE, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGreg HunterJeffrey J. Gonda
Amanda Kay Roberts
AppellantStaci HunterJeffrey J. Gonda
Amanda Kay Roberts
AppelleeRon ReeceVincent Paul Schutte
AppelleeLinda ReeceVincent Paul Schutte

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 97
Citation:2011 WY 97

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
11/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants, Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2010Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, received copies of motion, requested a signed originalEventPhone CallFinal
12/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Vincent P. Schutte for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Amanda Roberts for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Amanda Kay Roberts for appellants; Vincent Paul Schutte for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/23/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal