Case Information: 20-AA-0177 | |||
Short Caption: | HAZEM ELSAMAHY V. TYLENE COCKRELL | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Employment Services |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | OWH4-19 | Filed Date: | 02/21/2020 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/21/2020 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/17/2020 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Hazem Elsamahy | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | Tylene Cockrell | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services - Unemployment | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
02/21/2020 | Filed | Filing Fee Paid | ||
02/21/2020 | Filed | Petition For Review | ||
03/02/2020 | Filed | Service Of Petition On Agency/Bd | ||
03/16/2020 | Filed | Order To Show Cause | ||
03/16/2020 | Filed | TMC | ||
07/20/2020 | Filed | ORDER DISMISSING the petition for review for lack of standing... | ||
07/20/2020 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
08/17/2020 | Filed | Mandate |