judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY L. GREEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0576
Short Caption:ANTHONY L. GREEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM160-11Filed Date:05/05/2011

Opening Event Date:05/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony L. Green Y
Cedric D. MillerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sarah J. Schall YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/05/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric Miller, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric Miller, Esquire
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6pgs/Tape) 5/3/11 proc. (I)
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (73pgs/Tape) 5/3/11 proc. w/CD (II)
06/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/06/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/09/2011RECORD INDEX
06/09/2011RECORD COPIES
07/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 22, 2011
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until September 6, 2011
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix and directing appellee's brief within 30 days
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/26/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledSubmitted To Oberly,Easterly,King
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
04/06/2012FiledMandate