judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE, AN EMPLOYEE OF WYOMING WOMEN'S BUSINESS CENTER: ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0186)
Case Number:S-10-0186Case Docketed On:09/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE, AN EMPLOYEE OF WYOMING WOMEN'S BUSINESS CENTER: ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE, AN EMPLOYEE OF WYOMING WOMEN'S BUSINESS CENTER: ANDREA L. MCCALL-PRESSE, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndrea L. McCall-PresseSean W. Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 34
Citation:247 P.3d 505

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of substitution of counsel filed in District Court. Kelly Roseberry, Assistant Attorney General, as counsel for the State of Wyoming.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
10/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/01/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/21/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/30/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/28/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Combined application and motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs and notice of objection; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/22/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/25/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/24/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal