judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES M. SCHLINGER, CURTIS EXCAVATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and WW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. CHRISTOPHER M. McGHEE, JACK E. ROBINSON and CURTIS-WESTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company

Case Heading (S-10-0185)
Case Number:S-10-0185Case Docketed On:08/27/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JAMES M. SCHLINGER, CURTIS EXCAVATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and WW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. CHRISTOPHER M. McGHEE, JACK E. ROBINSON and CURTIS-WESTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company
Full Title:JAMES M. SCHLINGER, CURTIS EXCAVATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and WW CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellants (Defendants), v. CHRISTOPHER M. McGHEE, JACK E. ROBINSON and CURTIS-WESTWOOD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames M. SchlingerScott P. Klosterman
Patrick J. Murphy
AppellantCurtis Excavation, Inc., a Wyoming corporationScott P. Klosterman
Patrick J. Murphy
AppellantWW Construction, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyScott P. Klosterman
Patrick J. Murphy
AppelleeChristopher M. McGheeJ. Denny Moffett
Heather Noble
AppelleeJack E. RobinsonJ. Denny Moffett
Heather Noble
AppelleeCurtis-Westwood Construction, LLC, a Wyoming limited liablity companyJ. Denny Moffett
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2012 WY 7
Citation:268 P.3d 264

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/27/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/27/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/08/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief of appellants James M. Schlinger, Curtis Excavation, Inc., and WW ConstructionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/29/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief and Appellants' Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellees' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/13/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Klosterman for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Noble for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/21/2011Motion - Extension of time - Reply briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief of Appellants James M. Schlinger, Curtis Excavation, Inc., and WW ConstructionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply Brief. (Five copies of brief received, called counsel and requested sixth)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - additional copy of Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/09/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Scott P. Klosterman for appellants; Heather Noble for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/18/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/24/2012Petition - Rehearing - appellees.PetitionRehearingFinal
01/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' petition for rehearing and briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - grantOrderPetition for rehearing - grantFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/15/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal