judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATZ (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34995
Short Caption:STATZ (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33800
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR93P1197Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/12/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-10183
11/05/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10901
01/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. 00-00303
01/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice Regarding Transcript Request. 00-00607
02/16/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/16/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-02444
02/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief.
02/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-02852
03/20/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 3/17/00. 00-04378
04/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 17, 2000. 00-06031
05/12/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/12/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-07982
05/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall, within 7 days from the date of this order, certify and transmit to the clerk of this court (1) the "Video Tape of Statz Interviews #1 and #2," admitted into evidence as Exhibit 5 on September 16, 1999, and (2) the "Video Tape of Statz Interview #3," admitted into evidence as exhibit 6 on September 16, 1999. 00-19179
12/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We order the district court's denial of the post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-22181
01/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: State's Exhibit 5 (vidoetape of State Interviews #1 and #2); and (2) State's Exhibit 6 (videotape of State Interview #3) this day. 00-22575
01/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2001. 00-22575