judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAY ALLEN GRUWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0168)
Case Number:S-10-0168Case Docketed On:07/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JAY ALLEN GRUWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAY ALLEN GRUWELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJay Allen GruwellGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Tara Brooke Nethercott
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Samuel T. Hucke
Jessica Y. Frint

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 67
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
07/29/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
07/29/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
09/14/2010Brief - Appellant and Statement of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
09/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Jay Allen Gruwell; and Statement of Costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
10/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record on Appeal and Consent and Approval for Samuel T. Hucke and Jessica Y. Frint to appear on behalf of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gay Woodhouse and Tara Brooke Nethercott for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/22/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/08/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tara B. Nethercott and Gay V. Woodhouse, argument by Ms. Nethercott for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Samuel T. Hucke, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Hucke for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/18/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/09/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal